MD SB241 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a quorum requirement for the Electrology Practice Committee of the State Board of Nursing; establishing requirements as to when the Committee is to meet; providing that members of the Committee are entitled to specified compensation as determined by the Board and specified reimbursement for travel; requiring that applicants pass and schedule specified national and clinical examinations; extending the period of time the Board has to send renewal notices; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Changes to the Electrology Practice Committee and
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Electrologists
Electronic Government
Examinations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Nurses
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries
Criminal Background Investigations
Electrologists
Electronic Government
Examinations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Nurses
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries