MD SB24 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Highway Administration to sell or lease to a private entity the naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers, as specified; prohibiting the sale or lease of rest area and welcome center naming rights unless the Administration makes certain determinations; requiring the term of a contract for the sale or lease of naming rights to be at least 1 year; requiring the proceeds from the sale or lease of naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers to be credited to the Transportation Trust Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-0) (Y: 125 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (124-0)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-01-24SenateHearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-08-17SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback