MD SB239 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a small yacht club alcoholic beverages license in Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license for use by a small yacht club that meets certain criteria; specifying that the license authorizes a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor to members and their guests for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; authorizing a license holder to purchase alcoholic beverages from a retail dealer; specifying an annual license fee of $525; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Small Yacht Club License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 251 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB554 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 250
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Boats and Ships
Boundaries
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Piers and Docks
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Signatures
Voting
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Boats and Ships
Boundaries
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Piers and Docks
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Signatures
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1008.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |