MD SB239 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act; authorizing a user to direct a custodian of digital assets to disclose or not to disclose those assets under specified circumstances and in a specified manner; providing that the Act does not change, impair, or expand specified rights with respect to the digital assets of a user; authorizing a custodian to grant a specified fiduciary or designated recipient access to or a copy of specified records under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {866486/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {628976/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Civil Actions
Contracts
Courts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Guardians
Hearings
Liability
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Power of Attorney
Privacy
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Civil Actions
Contracts
Courts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Guardians
Hearings
Liability
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Power of Attorney
Privacy
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology