MD SB235 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain money paid into the Major Information Technology Development Fund shall be used to support a certain State telecommunication and computer network and the Statewide Public Safety Interoperability Radio System; and authorizing the Secretary of Information Technology to determine the portion of certain funds that may be allocated to each program.
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |