MD SB235 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the sales tax applies to a security service by a detective who is authorized to provide private detective services under specified provisions of law; declaring the intent of the General Assembly regarding the application of the sales tax to taxable services; clarifying that the Comptroller is prohibited from imposing the sales tax on specified services; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - Services
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-0) (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {249032/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |