MD SB235 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, in a prosecution for a specified sexual offense, evidence that the defendant committed specified sexually assaultive behavior may be admissible for specified reasons; requiring that the State file a motion of intent to introduce specified evidence at least 90 days before trial; authorizing the court to admit evidence of sexually assaultive behavior if the court finds that the evidence is being offered to prove lack of consent or rebut a specified allegation that a minor victim fabricated the sexual offense; etc.
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578679/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Evidence
Hearings
Juries
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Trials
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Evidence
Hearings
Juries
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Trials