MD SB234 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to designate specified areas as Health Enterprise Zones in a specified manner; specifying the purpose of establishing Health Enterprise Zones; authorizing the Secretary, in consultation with the Community Health Resources Commission, to adopt specified regulations; authorizing specified nonprofit community-based organizations or local government agencies to apply to the Secretary on behalf of specified areas for designation as specified Health Enterprise Zones; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Improvement and Disparities Reduction Act of 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (94-29) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-04 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | |
2012-04-04 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (37-10) | |
2012-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments 757173/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Finance & Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dentists
Enterprise Zones
Equipment
Ethnic Affairs
Grants
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Hospitals
Income Tax
Loans
Medical Schools
Mental Health
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurses
Patients
Physicians
Psychiatrists
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties
Dentists
Enterprise Zones
Equipment
Ethnic Affairs
Grants
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Hospitals
Income Tax
Loans
Medical Schools
Mental Health
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurses
Patients
Physicians
Psychiatrists
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment