MD SB232 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing surcharges for certain civil cases in the circuit courts from $55 to $75 per case and in the the District Court from $8 to $13 per summary ejectment case and from $18 to $24 per case for all other civil cases; and prohibiting the surcharge for a summary ejectment case from being passed on to a tenant.
Title
Civil Cases - Surcharges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB478 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Fees
Landlord and Tenant
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Fees
Landlord and Tenant
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0232?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0232f.pdf |