MD SB232 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the percentage of State money that must be used in an elementary or a secondary school construction project before the Prevailing Wage Law applies by altering specified definitions; etc.
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-43) (Y: 92 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-43) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2014-03-19 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {823121/1 Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Jones-Rodwell) {533126/1 Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {957072/3 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {957072/3 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Construction
Contractors
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Procurement
Public Schools
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Contractors
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Procurement
Public Schools
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment