MD SB230 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to allow corporations, partnerships, limited liability companies, and sole proprietorships that are small employers to be represented by certain authorized individuals rather than an attorney in certain hearings held by the Commissioner.
Title
Insurance - Hearing Representation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363722/1 Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB90 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Attorneys
Corporations
Health - Insurance
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Power of Attorney
Small Business
Corporations
Health - Insurance
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Power of Attorney
Small Business