MD SB227 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the exemptions that the Maryland Insurance Commissioner may provide to certain domestic insurance companies from certain reserve requirements; authorizing the Commissioner to exempt a certain domestic insurance company from certain requirements if the company meets the life principle-based reserve exemption criteria in the valuation manual; and repealing certain exemptions to certain reserve requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Principle-Based Reserves

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {337176/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-01-28SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback