MD SB226 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from knowingly or intentionally accessing and intentionally viewing a certain visual representation of a child under the age of 16 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Accessing and Intentionally Viewing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-16SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 759
2023-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2023-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2023-04-10HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-04-10HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2023-04-10HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2023-04-10HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2023-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2023-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {123823/1 Adopted
2023-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2023-01-26SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-23SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB233 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law11208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback