MD SB226 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Anne Arundel County and a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county and municipal corporation property tax imposed on specified residential property owned by specified blind individuals or surviving spouses of blind individuals; requiring that a property tax credit authorized by the Act shall be granted in addition to any property tax exemption authorized by law, except under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Blind Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Blind Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local