MD SB222 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education to elect a president and vice president from among its elected members at its annual meeting; establishing a term of 1 year for the president and vice president; providing that an individual who fills a certain vacancy may be elected to serve as president or vice president; and altering the date on which the county board is required to hold its annual meeting from on or as near as possible to the second Tuesday in July to on or as near as possible to the first Wednesday in December.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County Board of Education – Annual Meeting and Election of Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Motion Recede (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseHouse Recede
2020-03-18HouseSenate Requests House Recede
2020-03-18HouseSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2020-03-17SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2020-03-17SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
2020-03-17HouseFloor Amendment {823623/1 (Delegate Washington) Adopted
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {875961/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-14HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-02-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {994837/1 Adopted
2020-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-23SenateHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-18HouseMotion Recede (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)

Same As/Similar To

HB287 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education32A-06.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education4107(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback