MD SB22 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "administrator" and "plan" to apply certain provisions of law concerning the regulation of administrators of plans to include administrators of plans for life insurance and administrators that act on behalf of life insurers; and making conforming changes.
Title
Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Associations
Banks and Trust Companies
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Securities
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Associations
Banks and Trust Companies
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Securities
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment