MD SB22 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the minimum eligibility threshold for an award of lost earnings or support from the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; establishing eligibility for a specified award of up to 2 weeks of lost average weekly wages for a parent, child, or spouse of a victim who died as a direct result of a crime or delinquent act; and prohibiting a specified lost wage claim from exceeding $2,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claimant Award Basis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7
2017-03-27SenateReturned Passed
2017-03-24HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-23HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-23HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2017-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-14HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2017-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-02-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-06SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-01-18SenateHearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-09-28SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback