MD SB219 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of an "abandoned or sunken vessel" to mean one that has remained at a certain location for more than 30 instead of 90 days without the consent of the property owner, for purposes of certain provisions of the State Boat Act; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to take a certain abandoned or sunken vessel into custody without providing a certain notice if the Department determines that the vessel poses certain hazards or presents an obstruction to navigation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-17HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {740918/1 Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-11HouseHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-14HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-02-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {694438/1 Adopted
2020-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-17SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB143 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources8721(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0219?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0219f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0219t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0219e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0219_69443801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0219_74091801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0219_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0219_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0257.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1154.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1155.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1002.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback