MD SB219 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the disclosure of the identity or contact information of a specified victim or claimant by the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; and prohibiting a person who has been convicted of specified offenses from receiving a specified award from the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claimant
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Privacy
Sexual Offenses
Social Security
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Privacy
Sexual Offenses
Social Security
Victims
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0219.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0219f.pdf |