MD SB218 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that a retail alcoholic beverages license that grants the privilege to sell wine for off-premises consumption also grants the privilege to sell shochu and soju for off-premises consumption under certain terms and conditions; and defining "shochu" as a Japanese alcoholic beverage that contains not more than 24% of alcohol by volume and is derived from agricultural products and "soju" as a Korean alcoholic beverage that contains not more than 24% of alcohol by volume and is derived from agricultural products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Wine Sellers - Shochu and Soju

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {624335/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback