MD SB218 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the technical staff of the Public Service Commission to assist a water company or a sewage disposal company in establishing a proposed just and reasonable rate; authorizing the technical staff to seek information from specified companies under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to restrict the availability of specified staff-assisted rate cases to companies who gross annual revenues for a specified time period are below an amount determined by the Commission, not to exceed $1,000,000; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {137474/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Disclosure
Industry and Technology
Prices
Public Service Commission
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Industry and Technology
Prices
Public Service Commission
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water