MD SB215 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore City Community Enhancement Transit-Oriented Development Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund for specified purposes; providing for the contents and uses of the Fund; requiring that a portion of revenues from projects and other money, as specified, be paid into the Fund; requiring the Comptroller to pay specified money from the Fund to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City in a specified manner; authorizing the Mayor and Council to use or make awards of money received from the Fund for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Community Enhancement Transit-Oriented Development Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | |
2011-03-31 | Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters) | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Economic Matters & Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-01-28 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-27 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Community Development
Comptroller
Counties
Grants
Loans
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Community Development
Comptroller
Counties
Grants
Loans
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes