MD SB212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding to the Baltimore Metropolitan Council a member who is appointed by the Board of County Commissioners of Queen Anne's County; providing that the new member serves at the pleasure of the Board; and providing that a Delegate or Senator who represents a district located in Queen Anne's County may be appointed as a member of the Council.
Title
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Baltimore Metropolitan Council
County Commissioners
Economic and Community Development
Public Officials
Queen Anne's County
County Commissioners
Economic and Community Development
Public Officials
Queen Anne's County