MD SB212 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified death benefit provisions of the workers' compensation law apply only to specified covered employees of a municipal corporation or a county, and their dependents; altering the authority of the Workers' Compensation Commission to make determinations of dependency; altering the provisions relating to calculation of death benefits for individuals who are wholly or partly dependent; providing for the amount of death benefits to specified dependents; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Death Benefits - Dependency
Sponsors
Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-27 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Death
Diseases
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Funerals
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Counties
Death
Diseases
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Funerals
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation