MD SB212 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Second Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Second Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, except under specified circumstances, homeowners in a common ownership community and residential tenants may not be prohibited from displaying noncommercial signs, posters, flags, or banners on their premises, peacefully assembling on their property or contacting their neighbors, engaging in constitutionally protected activity relating to an election or vote, or restricted from using common property based on protected beliefs, expression, or activities; etc.
Title
Residential Property - Prohibited Restrictions on Exercise of Free Speech
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Rejected (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Second Reading Failed | |
2010-03-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-26) | |
2010-03-05 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-03-05 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Special Order 3/5 (Senator Pugh) Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys` Fees
Civil Actions
Condominiums
Contracts
Deeds
Flags
Homeowners Associations
Human Rights
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Political Candidates
Real Property
Signs and Billboards
Civil Actions
Condominiums
Contracts
Deeds
Flags
Homeowners Associations
Human Rights
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Political Candidates
Real Property
Signs and Billboards