MD SB211 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a behavioral health program located in a federally designated health professional shortage area to satisfy any regulatory requirement that the medical director be on-site through the medical director's use of telehealth.
Title
Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {597173/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Health
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology