MD SB211 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a licensed tree expert from supervising more than one company that provides tree expert services.
Title
Natural Resources - Tree Experts - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-18 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |