MD SB21 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Department of the Environment or the Board of Public Works from terminating or impairing the riparian rights of an individual, community association, or other entity through the application process for a permit or license to install a pier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Prohibition on Termination or Impairment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB214 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment16201.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback