MD SB21 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the holder of a manufacturer's license in each jurisdiction of the State to provide or conspicuously display a menu of food options or conspicuously display the actual food items available for purchase if the holder sells food for on-premises consumption; and applying the provisions of the Act to all jurisdictions without exception or variation.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses - Requirements for Food Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Food
Jurisdiction
Notices
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Signs and Billboards
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Food
Jurisdiction
Notices
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Signs and Billboards