MD SB21 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to recover unemployment insurance benefits by assessment in the same manner as provided in a specified provision of law for the assessment of past due contributions; and requiring the Secretary, if the Secretary seeks to recover specified unemployment benefits by assessment, to allow a claimant to elect, within 30 days of the date of the notice of assessment, to have the amount collected by suit instead of by assessment.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {847875/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-10-03 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assessments
Civil Actions
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Civil Actions
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance