MD SB21 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Applying to Cecil County and Queen Anne's County specified provisions authorizing the governing body of a county to contract with another governmental entity for the joint or cooperative performance of any governmental function; authorizing the governing body of a county to accept specified gifts or grants from the federal or State government and to use the gifts and grants for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Cecil County
Contracts
Counties - Generally
Federal Government
Gifts
Grants
Interstate Affairs
Queen Anne's County
State Aid
Contracts
Counties - Generally
Federal Government
Gifts
Grants
Interstate Affairs
Queen Anne's County
State Aid