MD SB21 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the penalties for specified violations concerning the abuse or neglect of animals; and authorizing a court, as a condition of sentencing, to prohibit a defendant convicted of violating specified animal abuse or neglect laws from owning, possessing, or residing with an animal for the life of the defendant or for a specified period of time; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Penalties and Conditions of Sentencing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2009-08-25 | Pre-filed |