MD SB208 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county to address, in a specified recycling plan, a method for implementing a specified reporting requirement; requiring specified owners, managers, and councils of apartment buildings or condominiums that contain 10 or more units to provide residents with the opportunity for recycling on or before October 1, 2014; clarifying that provisions of the Act do not affect the authority of a county, municipality, or other local government to enact and enforce specified recycling requirements; specifying a civil penalty; etc.
Title
Environment - Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-40) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 940713/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (33-12) | |
2012-03-31 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | |
2012-02-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments 644639/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 644639/1 | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Apartments
Condominiums
Counties
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Recycling
Reports
Condominiums
Counties
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Recycling
Reports