MD SB207 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a definition to make specified provisions of law requiring State's Attorney review of an application for a statement of charges against a law enforcement officer applicable to an application for a statement of charges against specified other law enforcement officers.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {938976/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Correctional Officers
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Sheriffs
State's Attorneys
Correctional Officers
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Sheriffs
State's Attorneys