MD SB207 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that specified time-stamped images of a motor vehicle taken by a speed monitoring or speed control system provide sufficient information to show the progression of the motor vehicle; limiting the placement of speed monitoring systems in school zones; requiring a calibration check to be performed quarterly rather than annually; altering specified prohibitions relating to the fee of a contractor that administers and processes specified civil citations; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-29) (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Glassman) {873724/1 Rejected (11-35) (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Glassman) {873724/1 Rejected (11-35) (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-29) |
2013-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {400714/1 Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Malone) Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Malone) Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {490412/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {733629/2 Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {873724/1 Rejected (11-35) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {773821/1 Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578570/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578570/1 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578570/1 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
Construction
Contractors
Evidence
Fees
Highways
Inspections
Laboratories
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Recordings
Records
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Work, Labor and Employment
Construction
Contractors
Evidence
Fees
Highways
Inspections
Laboratories
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Recordings
Records
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Work, Labor and Employment