MD SB201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the University of Maryland University College to be the University of Maryland Global Campus; requiring the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland, in consultation with and subject to the approval of the Department of Legislative Services, to correct cross-references and terminology rendered incorrect by the Act; etc.
Title
University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Communications
Higher Education
Names
Publications
Records
School Administration
Signs and Billboards
State Documents
State Universities and Colleges
Communications
Higher Education
Names
Publications
Records
School Administration
Signs and Billboards
State Documents
State Universities and Colleges