MD SB201 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Feb 28 @ 1:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a prescription drug or device manufacturer to submit certain average sales prices to the Maryland Department of Health for each calendar quarter within 30 days after the end of the quarter; requiring the Department to make the average sales price submitted by a manufacturer available on the Department's website not later than 10 days after it receives the average sales prices; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Prescription Drug Manufacturers - Sales to Wholesale Distributors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08SenateHearing canceled
2018-02-28SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29SenateHearing canceled
2018-01-31SenateHearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-17SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback