MD SB20 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee; and requiring the Committee to monitor and provide input and feedback to the Maryland Port Administration regarding the management of dredged material at the Cox Creek Dredged Material Containment Facility, advise the Administration of certain complaints, and make recommendations to the Administration on the potential impact that activities at the Facility may have on nearby communities and natural resources.
Title
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 806 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253429/1 Adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB343 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 807
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Anne Arundel County
Committees and Commissions
Dredging
Environment
Environmental Matters
Governor
Ports
Public Officials
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Anne Arundel County
Committees and Commissions
Dredging
Environment
Environmental Matters
Governor
Ports
Public Officials
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 5 | 1102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |