MD SB2 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court, under certain circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; specifying that a termination of parental rights terminates completely certain rights and the parent's responsibility to support the child, including payment of child support; requiring the court to refer an unrepresented parent to legal services or to appoint counsel; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {923729/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (21-26) (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3
2018-02-12SenateReturned Passed
2018-02-09HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2018-02-09HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (132-0)
2018-02-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-09HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-09HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-01-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-01-26SenateFloor Amendment {233522/1 (Senator Benson) Adopted
2018-01-26SenateFloor Amendment {953527/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
2018-01-26SenateFloor Amendment {923729/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (21-26)
2018-01-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {488777/1 Report Adopted
2018-01-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-01-11SenateHearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-08-15SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0002&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0002f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0002t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_3_sb0002t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0002_23352201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0002_48877701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0002_92372901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0002_95352701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0002.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0002_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0093.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0108.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0002_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0059.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0060.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback