MD SB2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on specified public land on any Sunday during the spring turkey hunting season in Dorchester County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-8) (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-8) |
2013-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {624832/1 Report Adopted |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-11-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |