MD SB199 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that specified regulations adopted by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene include a requirement that the process for approval of a license for an opioid maintenance program include an assessment of the number of existing slots in specified programs in a specified zip code and the number of individuals in need of specified services in a specified zip code, the severity of drug-related crime in a specified zip code, the population at risk of opioid addiction in a specified zip code, and the need for a program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Programs - Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-31HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2015-03-24SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {907979/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2015-02-18SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback