MD SB197 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,823,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for the renovation, repair, and capital improvements of qualified zone academies; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds and the further grant of funds to eligible school systems for specified purposes, subject to a requirement that the grantees document the provision of a required matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Capital Budget
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, State Department of
Public Schools
State Bonds
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, State Department of
Public Schools
State Bonds