MD SB196 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a soil conservation district to recommend a fee system to cover the cost of reviewing plans for small ponds; establishing that any fees collected under the Act shall be supplemental to county and State funds; requiring a soil conservation district, in developing a fee system for small pond plans, to determine for the succeeding year the reasonable cost of reviewing the plans; etc.
Title
Soil Conservation Districts - Small Ponds - Plan Review Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-25) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543121/1 Adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1465 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Erosion
Fees
Flood Control
Forms
Grants
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Loans
Natural Resources
Notices
Open Government
permits
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Publications
Real Estate
Real Property
Records
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
Soil Conservation
studies
Water
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Erosion
Fees
Flood Control
Forms
Grants
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Loans
Natural Resources
Notices
Open Government
permits
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Publications
Real Estate
Real Property
Records
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
Soil Conservation
studies
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 5 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |