MD SB196 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Wicomico County Board of License Commissioners to issue a beer tasting license and a beer/wine tasting license; providing for the fees, application forms, renewal, and issuance procedures for the licenses; altering the number of days during which specified events may be held; allowing an individual at least 16 years old who has a work permit to be employed at a licensed premises to stock alcoholic beverages or clear tables and bar areas; etc.
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-18 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Comptroller
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Wicomico County
Work, Labor and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Comptroller
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Wicomico County
Work, Labor and Employment