MD SB194 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a leasehold tenant of an unregistered ground lease from being required to hold more than 3 years of ground rent in escrow; requiring a ground lease holder to mail certain notices or bills to a leasehold tenant in a certain manner under certain circumstances; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to make available on its website the form a ground lease hold holder must use to provide to a leasehold tenant a certain notice; requiring a ground lease transferee to send notice of a transfer within 30 days; etc.
Title
Ground Leases – Notices and Billing – Forms and Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103624/1 Adopted |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB118 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Forms
internet
Landlords and Tenants
Leases and Rent
Notices
Real Property
Records
Forms
internet
Landlords and Tenants
Leases and Rent
Notices
Real Property
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 801.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |