MD SB189 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to require an individual to pass a polygraph examination before being appointed to serve as a correctional officer in a correctional facility; and requiring the Secretary to adopt regulations governing the administration of the polygraph examination required by the Act.
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-8) (Y: 124 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-8) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Lie Detection
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Lie Detection
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Rules and Regulations