MD SB187 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing or altering the distribution of certain revenue; altering or repealing certain required appropriations; requiring that any increase in judicial salary be included in the portion of the budget bill relating to the judiciary department; establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Fund to assist in providing a world-class education to Maryland students; requiring the Commission to make recommendations regarding inflationary indices to be used in certain formulas; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-38) (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-42) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted (84-50) (Y: 85 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {373625/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-86) (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10
2018-03-27SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (100-38)
2018-03-27HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-27SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-23House(Delegates Haynes and Kaiser)
2018-03-23HouseHouse advisors:
2018-03-23HouseDelegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel
2018-03-23HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-23HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2018-03-23Senate(Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini)
2018-03-23SenateSenate advisors:
2018-03-23SenateSenators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards
2018-03-23SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-23SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2018-03-23SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-21HouseFloor Amendment {373625/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-86)
2018-03-21HouseFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Amendment (#8-14) Adopted
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Amendment (#7) Adopted (84-50)
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Amendment (#6) Adopted
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Amendment (#5) Adopted
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Amendment (#3-4) Adopted
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Amendment (#2) Adopted
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Amendment (#1) Adopted
2018-03-21HouseFavorable with Amendments {694263/1
2018-03-21HouseFavorable with Amendments
2018-03-19HouseSpecial Order until 3/21 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {694263/1
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {133923/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment (#38-43) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment (#31-37) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment (#26-30) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment (#21-25) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment (#14-20) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment (#5-13) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {399834/1
2018-03-13SenateSpecial Order until 3/14 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2018-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {399834/1
2018-03-12SenateLaid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2018-03-12SenateMotion to Suspend Rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2018-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {399834/1
2018-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-28SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-17SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects

Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Drugs
Education
Environment, Department of
Grants
Health
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Hospitals
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Interest
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Operating Budget
Pollution
Prince George's County
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
State Universities and Colleges
Support of Dependents
Tax Returns
Teachers
Time
Treasurers
Women

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0187&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0187f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0187t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0187e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_10_sb0187e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0187_39983401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0187_13392301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0187_69426301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0187_37362501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0187_86332501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0187_44352401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0187.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0187_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2018rs-budget-docs-BRFA-Senate-Reprint.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0566.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2018rs-budget-docs-BRFA-House-Reprint.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0187_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0785.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0786.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0805.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0187_44352401.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0837.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0865.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/ag_letters/sb0187.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback