MD SB185 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State Budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-8) (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {653326/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 53 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {193822/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (48-87) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {843524/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (52-80) (Y: 53 N: 81 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {783823/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (55-80) (Y: 56 N: 81 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {893729/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11) (Y: 127 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {693329/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87) (Y: 50 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {653827/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86) (Y: 51 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {783828/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86) (Y: 51 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#52) Adopted (84-47) (Y: 85 N: 48 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {303820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {873727/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-33) (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-8) (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {653326/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 53 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {193822/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (48-87) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {843524/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (52-80) (Y: 53 N: 81 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {783823/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (55-80) (Y: 56 N: 81 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {893729/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11) (Y: 127 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {693329/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87) (Y: 50 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {653827/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86) (Y: 51 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {783828/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86) (Y: 51 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#52) Adopted (84-47) (Y: 85 N: 48 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {303820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {873727/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-33) (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 570 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-8) |
2018-03-27 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate McMillan) Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate McMillan) Withdrawn |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | (Delegates Haynes and Kaiser) |
2018-03-23 | House | House advisors: |
2018-03-23 | House | Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel |
2018-03-23 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-03-23 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2018-03-23 | Senate | (Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate advisors: |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {693329/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {783828/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {653827/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {653326/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {193822/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (48-87) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {893729/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {843524/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (52-80) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {783823/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (55-80) |
2018-03-22 | House | Floor Amendment {633120/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#60-65) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#53-59) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#52) Adopted (84-47) |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#39-51) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#28-38) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#20-27) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#10-19) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Amendment (#1-9) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873727/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-33) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {303820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#137-138) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#126-136) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#108-125) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#102-107) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#94-101) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#75-93) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#65-74) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#56-64) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#41-55) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#26-40) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#11-25) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1-10) Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |