MD SB185 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from February 28 to January 31 of each year, the date by which specified payors of amounts subject to income tax withholding are required to provide the Comptroller a copy of a withholding statement.
Title
Income Tax - Filing of Withholding Statements
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Edward Kasemeyer [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Stephen Waugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {999334/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |