MD SB183 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the county boards of education receive a specified grant to reflect regional differences in the cost of education that are due to factors outside of the control of the local jurisdiction; repealing a provision that allowed for the reduction of a grant under specified circumstances; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Title
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-51) (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {533628/1 Rejected (50-89) (Y: 50 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (ODonnell) Rejected (48-91) (Y: 48 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {833324/1 Rejected (48-91) (Y: 48 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Parrott) Rejected (49-89) (Y: 49 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion limit debate (Pugh) Adopted (30-15) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {533628/1 Rejected (50-89) (Y: 50 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (ODonnell) Rejected (48-91) (Y: 48 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {833324/1 Rejected (48-91) (Y: 48 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Parrott) Rejected (49-89) (Y: 49 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion limit debate (Pugh) Adopted (30-15) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-51) |
2015-04-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {533628/1 Rejected (50-89) |
2015-04-13 | House | Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (48-91) |
2015-04-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {833324/1 Rejected (48-91) |
2015-04-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (49-89) |
2015-04-13 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {703928/1 |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {599638/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {599638/1 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Education, Boards of
Grants
Legislation
Operating Budget
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Aid
Budgets
Education, Boards of
Grants
Legislation
Operating Budget
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Aid